WV SB467 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow county commissioners an ongoing mechanism to consider compensation increases for elected county official every two years in an amount up to the increase in the annual Consumer Price Index published by the United States Department of Commerce over the prior two years.
Title
Providing county commissioners ongoing mechanism to consider compensation increases for elected officials every two years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-16 | House | To House Government Organization |
2023-02-16 | House | To Government Organization |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |