WV SB467 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prevent certain current or former spouses, current or former sexual or intimate partners, parents, guardians and household members from seeking to have their criminal records expunged. The bill provides that the section on expungement is consistent with similar language in
Title
Updating code section relating to expungement of criminal convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4443 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29A | 3 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |