WV SB467 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To House Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To House Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise stocking permit requirements for the release of aquatic species into state waters.
Title
Revising stocking permit requirements for release of aquatic species into state waters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | To House Natural Resources |
2013-04-02 | House | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |