WV SB467 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to redefine planning periods for teachers.
Title
Requiring incidence reports when teachers are unlawfully assigned any responsibility during their planning period
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | To House Education | |
2011-03-02 | To Education then Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-01 | Title amendment adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2011-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-01 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-01 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2011-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-08 | To Education | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | To Education | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Similar To) 2011-01-12 - To House Education
HB2554 (Same As) 2011-01-19 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
HB3035 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - To House Education
HB2554 (Same As) 2011-01-19 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
HB3035 (Same As) 2011-02-07 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |