WV SB462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act; and specify effective dates.
Title
Updating definitions of certain terms used in Personal Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 51) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 252, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Approved by Governor 2/8/2024 - House Journal |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/7/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/7/2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | To Governor 2/1/2024 - House Journal |
2024-02-01 | Senate | To Governor 2/1/2024 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-01-29 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 51) |
2024-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 50) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | Reference dispensed |
2024-01-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-01-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4878 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |