WV SB461 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for personal income tax withholding on certain lottery winnings
Title
Relating generally to lottery prizes
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 600) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 599) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 599) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 600) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 599) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-14 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 132) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |