WV SB455 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to set forth prohibited clauses in State banking contracts and to remove the date by which the Public Deposits Program must be operable under the West Virginia Security for Deposits Act to allow discretion for program implementation.
Title
Relating generally to banking and contractual authority of State Treasurer’s Office
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-15 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-15 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4801 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Chapter 230, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 1B | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 1B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |