WV SB439 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the speed and dexterity with which the Department of Environmental Protection is able to send out projects related to incoming federal infrastructure grants for bid and to construct those projects within the narrow timeframes allowed by the federal grant administrators. The bill provides a short title; establishes the West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection Design-Build Pilot Program; provides for an invitation for bids; and sets forth bid requirements.
Title
Establishing design-build program for DEP
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
Sen. Jay Taylor [R] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 399) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 399) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 489) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 399) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 489) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/9/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 399) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 399) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 490) |
2023-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 489) |
2023-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-02 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Do pass |
2023-02-15 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2023-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Technology and Infrastructure |
2023-01-31 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2023-01-31 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing then Technology and Infrastructure |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 99) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3129 (Similar To) 2023-01-27 - To House Energy and Manufacturing
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 34 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 34 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |