WV SB434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring training for law-enforcement officers specific to interviewing victims of sexual assault
Title
Requiring training for law-enforcement officers responsible for investigating crimes of sexual assault
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 460) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-14 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 460) |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 78) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |