WV SB434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the revocation period for DUI offenders if the person is eligible for the Alcohol Test and Lock Program, applies for the Program prior to the effective date of the revocation, agrees to use the Test and Lock Device for the required length of the Program and waives any right to an administrative hearing.
Title
Eliminating revocation period for certain DUI offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 330) (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 330) (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 12) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 330) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4377 (Similar To) 2014-02-06 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |