WV SB434 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing suggestion and suggestee execution contain certain information
Title
Providing suggestion and suggestee execution contain certain information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 224) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 223) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 223) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/9/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-09 | To Governor 3/9/12 | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/9/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-05 | House Message received | |
2012-03-02 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-02 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 224) | |
2012-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 223) | |
2012-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-02 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-29 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Do pass | |
2012-02-09 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-09 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-08 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) | |
2012-02-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-03 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-26 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-26 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
38 | 5A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |