WV SB426 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the Division of Natural Resources’ legislative rule relating to the Litter Control Grant Program.
Title
Repealing DNR legislative rule on litter control grant program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB237 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - To House Judiciary