WV SB237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal obsolete rules relating to the Department of Revenue, and the banking and insurance commissioners.
Title
Repealing obsolete rules of Department of Revenue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 12 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 12 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |