WV SB426 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to alleviate any lapse in filling vacancies and to ensure that members are not forced to serve beyond their appointment time.
Title
Relating to appointments to certain higher education commissions, councils and boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 81) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 81) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 405) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 404) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 81) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 405) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 404) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 81) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 81) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 405) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 404) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | To House Education |
2014-02-11 | House | To Education |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-23 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-23 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |