WV SB421 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide an exemption for the official mascot of Parkersburg South High School, commonly known as "The Patriot," which would allow the mascot to carry a musket on school grounds when the mascot is acting in his or her official capacity. This is the same exemption that is granted to the West Virginia University Mountaineer.
Title
Exempting certain school mascot from prohibition of firearms possession on school grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/17/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/17/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/15/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | To Governor 4/15/13 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 210) |
2013-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | House | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-03 | House | Reference dispensed |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 10) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | To Education |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-04 | Senate | To Education then Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |