WV SB414 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the law pertaining to the issuance of hunting and fishing licenses. It clarifies who are license issuing authorities.
Title
Clarifying hunting and fishing license-issuing authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 383) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 98) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 98) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 98) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 383) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2013-04-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-03-27 | House | To House Natural Resources |
2013-03-27 | House | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-01 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |