WV SB412 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to raise the civil penalties that the Public Service Commission can impose for violations of Gas Pipeline Safety Act from the existing $1,000 for each violation to $100,000 for each day of violation to a maximum of $1 million for any related series of violations. This change would mirror the federal regulations.
Title
Increasing PSC civil penalties for Gas Pipeline Safety Act violations
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Browning [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Art Kirkendoll [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mark Wills [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-02-29 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-28 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-24 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-14 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | To Energy, Industry and Mining | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-25 | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24B | 4 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |