WV SB402 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Division of Forestry investigate and enforce timber theft violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing Division of Forestry investigate and enforce timber theft violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 669) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 524) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 524)
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 669)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 425)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 524)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2019-02-21HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-21HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 186)
2019-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-21SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-20SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-19SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-19SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-02-08SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateTo Natural Resources
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-23SenateTo Natural Resources then Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2717 (Similar To) 2019-01-29 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
191A3bAmended CodeCitation Text
61352Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=402&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB402%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=402
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB402%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=402
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB402%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=402
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB402%20SUB2%20enr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=402
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-21-0186.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00524.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0425.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00669.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0524.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback