WV SB4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to Municipal Home Rule Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to Municipal Home Rule Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 667) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 448) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 511) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 510) (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 509) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 508) (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 507) (Y: 23 N: 75 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 52) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 51) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 667)
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-08SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 448)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 512)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Roll No. 511)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 510)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 509)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 508)
2019-03-07HouseAmendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 507)
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender
2019-03-06HouseAmendments pending
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-04HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-04HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-01SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 52)
2019-02-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-01SenateRomano Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 51)
2019-02-01SenateWeld/Jeffries Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-01SenatePalumbo Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-01SenateWeld Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-31SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/31/19 with right to amend
2019-01-30SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19 with right to amend
2019-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2019-01-29SenateFloor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
2019-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-28SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-28SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-09SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
815aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB4%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=4
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB4%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=4
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB4%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=4
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB4%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=4
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-01-0051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-01-0052.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00507.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00508.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00509.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00510.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00511.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00512.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0448.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00667.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback