WV SB398 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to compensation for senior judges
Title
Relating to compensation for senior judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 695) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 694) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 473) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 473) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 598) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 597) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 78) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 694) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 473) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 473) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 598) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 597) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 78) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 695) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 694) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 473) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 473) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 598) |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 597) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 78) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-23 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 1 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |