WV SB39 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - To Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require a jobs impact statement to be completed by the West Virginia Development Office for certain proposed legislation which may impact both short-term and long-term jobs in this state. The bill creates the Jobs Impact Statement Act. The bill makes legislative findings. The bill also sets forth the contents of a jobs impact statement and the availability of the statements.
Title
Creating Jobs Impact Statement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. William Cole [R] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2507 (Similar To) 2013-02-15 - To House Judiciary
SB187 (Similar To) 2013-03-27 - To House Judiciary
HB2844 (Similar To) 2013-03-06 - To House Judiciary
SB187 (Similar To) 2013-03-27 - To House Judiciary
HB2844 (Similar To) 2013-03-06 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2I | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2I | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |