WV SB389 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Board of Registration for Professional Engineers license renewals and reinstatements
Title
Relating to Board of Registration for Professional Engineers license renewals and reinstatements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 549) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 263) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 262) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Senate amended and repassed (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 86) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 549) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 263) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 262) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - Senate - Senate amended and repassed (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 86) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 191, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 550) |
2015-03-14 | House | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 549) |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2015-03-14 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/11/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 4) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/11/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/11/15 |
2015-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/15 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 263) |
2015-03-02 | House | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 262) |
2015-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2015-03-02 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2015-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 1) |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Senate amended and repassed (Roll No. 1) |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 2/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 2/27/15 |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 86) |
2015-02-17 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 85) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-02-09 | House | To Government Organization |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Originating in Senate Government Organization |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 13 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |