WV SB38 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creating 5-year tax credit for new businesses locating on post-mine sites
Title
Creating 5-year tax credit for new businesses locating on post-mine sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 251) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | To Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 251) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |