WV SB378 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for renewal of a previously nonrenewed electrician's license without retesting, if the electrician pays a double fee and the nonrenewed license had not been revoked.
Title
Relicensing electricians without retesting under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] |
Sen. Art Kirkendoll [D] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 131) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 130) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 131) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 130) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 131) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 130) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-02-17 | House | To Government Organization |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-30 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-30 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2E | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |