WV SB36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 240, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 240, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing adjustment of gross income for calculating personal income liability for certain retirees
Title
Allowing adjustment of gross income for calculating personal income liability for certain retirees
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 518) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 518) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 581) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 580) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 518) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 581) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 580) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 240, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 518) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 518) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 581) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 580) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-03-05 | House | House further considered bill |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Finance |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2019-01-17 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 5) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |