WV SB348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the definition of "electioneering communication" to be consistent with the Federal Election Commission.
Title
Updating definition of "electioneering communication" to be consistent with FEC
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-24 - Senate - Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 236) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Effective January 1, 2025 (Roll No. 236) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |