WV SB340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing obsolete provisions of WV Medical Professional Liability Insurance Joint Underwriting Association
Title
Repealing obsolete provisions of code relating to WV Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 591) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 591) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-21 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 184) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |