WV SB329 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updating provisions of sales and use tax
Title
Updating provisions of sales and use tax
Sponsors
Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Do pass | |
2011-02-17 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-17 | To Finance | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-16 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-16 | Title amendment adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-02-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-16 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-14 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-14 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-11 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2011-01-27 | To Finance | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-26 | To Finance | |
2011-01-27 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2928 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15B | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15B | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15B | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |