WV SB328 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating West Virginia Veterans Program Fund
Title
Creating West Virginia Veterans Program Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2016-02-16 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-20 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB77 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To Military
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 12 | 86 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 26 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3E | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3E | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 3E | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3E | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 11b | New Code | See Bill Text |