WV SB328 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the Strategic Research and Development Tax Credit.
Title
Terminating Strategic Research and Development Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 246) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 245) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 246) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 245) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/14 |
2014-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 246) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 245) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-20 | House | To House Finance |
2014-02-20 | House | To Finance |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-30 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2014-01-10 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-10 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4148 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - To House Finance