WV SB326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require department of defense family advocacy groups to be notified about any abuse or neglect of a child of a military person.
Title
Requiring Department of Defense family advocacy groups be notified about abuse or neglect of military member's child
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Richard Ojeda [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 108) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2017-03-15 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 108) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-15 | Senate | To Military |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | To Military then Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 2 | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |