WV SB326 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a process for making appropriation requests for the state system of higher education based on progress toward meeting established objectives and to establish a process for collecting and sharing data between WVNET and state institutions of higher education.
Title
Establishing appropriation request process for higher education system
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | To Finance |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Education |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2566 (Same As) 2013-02-26 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 2A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |