WV SB324 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish incentives to attract and retain young talent to the State of West Virginia.
Title
Establishing tax credit for repayment of certain student loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2010-03-03 | To Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2010-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-25 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2010-01-29 | To Finance | |
2010-01-29 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2010-01-21 | To Education | |
2010-01-21 | To Education then Finance | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-21 | To Education then Finance | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13AA | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13AA | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13AA | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13AA | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 21 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=324&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |