WV SB321 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Rereferred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Rereferred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prevent municipalities from targeting protected businesses with planning and zoning ordinances more restrictive than those placed upon other businesses.
Title
Limiting municipalities’ authority to restrict purchase and storage of weapons and ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 1st reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4782 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Chapter 268, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 12 | 5A | Amended Code | Citation Text |