WV SB321 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to powers and duties of Public Land Corporation
Title
Relating to powers and duties of Public Land Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 112) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | To Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 112) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB230 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
HB4348 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To House Finance
HB4437 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To House Energy
HB4348 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To House Finance
HB4437 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - To House Energy
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |