WV SB230 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
DNR rule relating to controlling public land corporation's sale, lease, exchange, or transfer of land or minerals
Title
Authorizing Department of Commerce promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 469) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 469) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 440) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 469) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 440) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 469) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 469) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) |
2018-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 440) |
2018-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 76) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4108 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |