WV SB312 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcohol Beverage Control Commission rule relating to private club licensing
Title
Authorization for Department of Revenue to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 666) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 665) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 559) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 95) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 665) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 486) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 559) (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 95) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 666) |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 665) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 486) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 486) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Effective July 1, 2022 (Roll No. 559) |
2022-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 558) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-11 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-11 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 95) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4151 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |