WV SB3040 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 26, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 26, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplemental appropriation to Department of Economic Development, Office of the Secretary
Title
Making supplemental appropriation to Department of Economic Development, Office of the Secretary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 846) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 845) (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 844) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 56) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 845) (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 844) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 56) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Chapter 26, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-20 | Senate | To Governor 10-22-21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-20 | House | To Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | To Governor 10-22-21 |
2021-10-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-10-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-10-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 846) |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 845) |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 844) |
2021-10-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-10-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 57) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 57) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 56) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Originating in Senate Rules |