WV SB3033 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 36, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 36, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to composition of congressional districts
Title
Relating to composition of congressional districts
Sponsors
Sen. Chandler Swope [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 825) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 823) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 823) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Chapter 36, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 |
2021-10-20 | House | To Governor 10/19/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-19 | Senate | To Governor 10/19/21 |
2021-10-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-10-15 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-10-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 825) |
2021-10-15 | House | House further considered bill |
2021-10-15 | House | The bill still being in possession of the clerk |
2021-10-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 823) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) |
2021-10-14 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-13 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-10-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Originating in Senate Redistricting |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |