WV SB297 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - To House Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - To House Economic Development and Tourism
Pending: House Economic Development and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the Mountain Homes Act and creating the Mountain Homes Fund to remove barriers to funding for home construction with the goal of promoting a sustainable quality of life for the state's workforce.
Title
Mountain Homes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Bennett Queen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 231) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-02-23 | House | To Economic Development and Tourism then Finance |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 231) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-01-19 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-19 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 2K | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5B | 2K | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |