WV SB283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 39, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 39, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to simplify the process by which a bank may adjust the hours of operation for branch offices and reduce the time the Division of Financial Institutions has to act on an expedited branch application.
Title
Relating to state banking institutions
Sponsors
Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 413) (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 39, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/15 |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 413) |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-06 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-03-06 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-02-24 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-22 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2379 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 4 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31A | 8 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |