WV SB275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax on purchases of intoxicating liquors
Title
Relating to tax on purchases of intoxicating liquors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 561) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 228, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 561) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 458) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 400) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 186) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 5d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3 | 9d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |