WV SB270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Streamlining process for utilities access to DOH rights-of-way
Title
Streamlining process for utilities access to DOH rights-of-way
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 219) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 218) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 218) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 235, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 |
2019-03-01 | House | To Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 219) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 218) |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 56) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/30/19 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/29/19 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2416 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 2A | 17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 2E | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 2E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 2E | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |