WV SB267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 91, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring State Board of Education adopt policy detailing level of computer science instruction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring State Board of Education adopt policy detailing level of computer science instruction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 117) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 84) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 91, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-02-20HouseApproved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal
2019-02-20SenateApproved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-19SenateApproved by Governor 2/19/19
2019-02-18SenateTo Governor 2/15/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-18HouseTo Governor 2/15/19 - House Journal
2019-02-15SenateTo Governor 2/15/19
2019-02-12SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-11HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-02-11HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed House (Roll No. 117)
2019-02-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-11HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-07HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-07HouseImmediate consideration
2019-02-07HouseReference dispensed
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-06SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 84)
2019-02-06SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-06SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-05SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-05SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-04SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-04SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-01SenateReported do pass
2019-01-11SenateTo Education
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-11SenateTo Education
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2415 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Tabled on 2nd reading, Special Calendar

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback