WV SB256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing certain deductions from individual personal income tax refunds
Title
Allowing certain deductions from individual personal income tax refunds
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 46) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 46) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 10 | 14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |