WV SB255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reform the procedures for the appointment of county officials in the event of a vacancy.
Title
Relating generally to filling vacancies in elected office
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 439) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 405) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 134) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 405) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 134) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 439) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 405) |
2017-04-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 134) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/15/17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/14/17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |