WV SB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing selection procedure for state delegates to Article V convention
Title
Providing selection procedure for state delegates to Article V convention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 260) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 260) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 11A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 11A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 11A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 11A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 11A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |