WV SB249 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - To conference
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-11 - To conference
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the start of the instructional school term on August 21 and to provide greater flexibility for county school boards to meet the requirement that there be one hundred eighty instructional days in the annual school calendar. The bill also provides for the scheduling of an additional noninstructional day prior to the commencement of the instructional term.
Title
Relating to annual school calendar
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-11 | To conference | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to House | |
2009-04-11 | Senate appoints conference committee: Edgell, Browning, Foster, Laird, Boley | |
2009-04-11 | Senate agreed to conference | |
2009-04-11 | House Message received | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-11 | House appointed conferees: Pethtel, Perry, Ennis, Rowan, Romine | |
2009-04-11 | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | House received Senate message | |
2009-04-11 | Communicated to House | |
2009-04-11 | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) | |
2009-04-11 | House Message received | |
2009-04-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-10 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 370) | |
2009-04-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 369) | |
2009-04-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-10 | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 368) | |
2009-04-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-04-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2009-04-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2009-03-26 | To House Education | |
2009-03-26 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-03-26 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-25 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2009-03-25 | Effective July 1, 2009 (Roll No. 11) | |
2009-03-25 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 11) | |
2009-03-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-25 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-25 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2009-03-25 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-03-25 | Special Order of Business on 3rd reading when 5PM session convenes | |
2009-03-25 | Motion | |
2009-03-25 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-23 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-23 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-20 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-04 | To Finance | |
2009-03-04 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2009-02-13 | To Education | |
2009-02-13 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-13 | To Education then Finance | |
2009-02-13 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Same As) 2009-02-13 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9A | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18A | 4 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=249&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |