WV SB238 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add "sexual orientation" to the categories covered by the Human Rights Act prohibiting discrimination in employment and places of public accommodations. This bill also provides clarification as to an exemption from the "sexual orientation" employment-based proscriptions of this bill for "religious institutions" and offers, for the purposes of this article, a definition thereof. This bill also adds "age" and "sexual orientation" to the categories covered by the Fair Housing Act prohibiting discrimination in housing. It defines "sexual orientation" as "heterosexuality, bisexuality, homosexuality or gender identity, whether actual or perceived."
Title
Prohibiting discrimination based upon age or sexual orientation
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-03-16 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-13 | Ordered to House | |
2009-03-13 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2009-03-13 | Rejected by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-13 | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/13/09 | |
2009-03-13 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-13 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-12 | Rejected (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-12 | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading | |
2009-03-12 | Motion | |
2009-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-10 | Committee substitute reported | |
2009-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2454 (Similar To) 2009-02-16 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
HB2925 (Similar To) 2009-03-03 - To House Judiciary
HB2925 (Similar To) 2009-03-03 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=238&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |