WV SB237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize county commissions, municipalities and boards of education that receive lottery revenues to issue bonds secured by such lottery revenues to construct public projects. This will allow county commissions, municipalities and boards of education to construct more public projects which creates jobs and stimulates the economy.
Title
Authorizing issuance of revenue bonds for public projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate reconsidered effective date and passage | |
2010-03-13 | The bill still being in the possession of Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests return of bill from House | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5) | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 314) | |
2010-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 313) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Do pass | |
2010-02-25 | To House Finance | |
2010-02-25 | To Finance | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-24 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-24 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) | |
2010-02-24 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) | |
2010-02-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-24 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-23 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-02-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-23 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-22 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-19 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2010-01-20 | To Finance | |
2010-01-20 | To Finance | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-20 | To Finance | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4458 (Same As) 2010-02-18 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2H | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 2H | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22C | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=237&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |